+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 578'18 WITH IMMEDIATE EFFECT 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/28/2018 @ 12:25 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/28/2018 @ 3:46 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/27/2018 @ 12:30 pm
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 909 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Returned to Senate
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Given immediate effect
- Ordered enrolled
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed by 2/3 vote roll call # 603 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Received on 11/27/2018
- Read a first time
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator goeffrey hansen
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor