+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0228'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 10/16/2020 02:46 pm
- Presented to governor 10/16/2020 01:28 pm
- Filed with secretary of state 10/16/2020 05:32 pm
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
- Referred to second reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- House substitute (h-1) concurred in
- Roll call: roll call # 402 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- Given immediate effect
- Full title agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 471 Yeas 85 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-4) as amended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-4) and amendment(s)
- Substitute (s-4) as amended concurred in
- Passed roll call # 398 yeas 36 nays 2 excused 0 not voting 0
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
On October 8, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 10/08/2020
On October 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-3)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-3)
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
- Introduced by senator lana theis
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor