+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0222'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 10/16/2020 05:20 pm
- Approved by governor 10/16/2020 08:06 am
On October 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 10/05/2020 11:54 am
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 434 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/16/2020
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 315 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
- Introduced by senator curtis hertel, jr.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor