+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by governor 03/30/2017
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 3/21/2017 @ 12:54 pm
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 54 yeas 34 nays 1 excused 3 not voting 0
- House substitute h-2 concurred in
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 17 Yeas 83 Nays 24
- Read a third time
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
- Referred to second reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Received on 02/02/2017
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 7 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on michigan competitiveness
- Introduced by senator patrick colbeck
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor