+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0443'14
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 12/30/2014 @ 4:10 PM
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 12/27/2014 @ 9:00 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:34 am
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 683 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Referred to second reading
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Received on 11/06/2014
On November 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 649 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
- Introduced by senator mark jansen
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor