+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0199'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 10/15/2020 12:10 pm
- Approved by governor 10/15/2020 09:40 am
On October 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 10/05/2020 11:40 am
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 428 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Received on 09/10/2020
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 286 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On September 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On August 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
- Introduced by senator jon c. bumstead
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor