+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 1/2/2015 @ 9:56 AM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 737 Yeas 92 Nays 17
- Read a third time
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 397 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Received on 06/10/2014
- Read a first time
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator tonya schuitmaker
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor