+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 30, 2020 in the House:
- ASSIGNED PA 0394'20
- APPROVED BY GOVERNOR 01/04/2021 11:06 AM
- FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE 01/04/2021 01:20 PM
On December 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 12/22/2020 04:37 pm
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call: roll call # 604 yeas 34 nays 3 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute (h-1) concurred in
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 600 Yeas 90 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Inserted full title
- Returned to Senate
On December 8, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Received on 12/04/2020
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 425 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-3)
- Substitute (s-3) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-3)
On October 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-3)
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-3)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
- Introduced by senator jeff irwin
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor