+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 30, 2016 in the House:
- PRESENTED TO GOVERNOR 12/28/2016 @ 3:18 PM 12/30/16 ADDENDA
On December 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Immediate effect defeated
- Roll call # 843 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-1 concurred in
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed Roll Call # 733 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
- Referred to second reading
On November 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Received on 10/20/2016
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 610 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
- Introduced by senator judith emmons
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor