+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0173'15 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 11/5/2015 @ 9:46 am
- Filed with secretary of state 11/5/2015 @ 10:15 am
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 10/22/2015 @ 3:00 pm
On October 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Given immediate effect
- Roll call # 441 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
- House substitute h-8 concurred in
On October 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on immediate passage
- Substitute H-8 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Title amended
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 97 Nays 8
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-8
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 212 yeas 22 nays 15 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Amendment(s) adopted
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received on 05/20/2015
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-4 as amended
- Substitute s-4 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-4 and amendment(s)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
- Introduced by senator phillip pavlov
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor