+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Received on 06/23/2022
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 348 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
- Introduced by senator curtis s. vanderwall