+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 290'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by governor 6/27/2018 @ 8:06 pm
- Filed with secretary of state 6/29/2018 @ 1:08 pm
On July 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 6/20/2018 @ 3:20 pm
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Given immediate effect
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 499 Yeas 101 Nays 8
- Read a third time
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Received on 05/29/2018
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 376 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
- Introduced by senator wayne schmidt
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor