+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0021'19 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 06/11/2019 03:22 pm
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by governor 05/30/2019 10:23 am
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 05/29/2019 12:40 pm
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 105 Yeas 94 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Substitute (H-1) not adopted
- Substitute (H-3) adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Read a second time
- Title amended
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) defeated
- House substitute (s-1) to senate substitute (h-3) concurred in
- Roll call: roll call # 122 yeas 34 nays 4 excused 0 not voting 0
- Given immediate effect
- Title amendment agreed to
- Ordered enrolled
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Received on 05/08/2019
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substitute (s-1) as amended concurred in
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1) and amendment(s)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read a first time
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1) as amended
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Passed roll call # 60 yeas 24 nays 14 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Select Committee on Reducing Car Insurance Rates
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on insurance and banking
- Introduced by senator aric nesbitt