+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted by Senate - referred to the Clerk for record
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of resolutions
- Reported favorably without amendment
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
- Rules suspended
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted and transmitted
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Introduced by Representative Lee Chatfield
+ − Sponsors (95)
Type:
Primary Sponsor