+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted by Senate - referred to the Clerk for record
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of resolutions
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On October 3, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted and transmitted
On September 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
- Introduced by Representative Jim Lilly
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor