+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Roll Call # 361 Yeas 107 Nays 1
- Adopted by 2/3 vote
- Read a third time
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Printed joint resolution filed 03/27/2015
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Runestad
+ − Sponsors (61)
Type:
Primary Sponsor