+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 522'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:05 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:52 PM
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:26 PM
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Placed on order of third reading
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 885 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 790 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 12/04/2018
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Runestad
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor