+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On December 12, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 788 Yeas 77 Nays 32
- Read a third time
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/27/2018
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Beau LaFave
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor