+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 571'18
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 3:22 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 12:13 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 4:46 PM
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 1030 Yeas 105 Nays 1
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s)
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate effect defeated
- Passed roll call # 970 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 660 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/26/2018
On September 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Bizon