+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 249'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 11/05/2020 10:08 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 11/05/2020 11:20 AM
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/26/2020 03:08 PM
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Rules suspended
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on order of third reading
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 416 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled 10/21/2020
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Substitute (H-2) adopted and amended
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Transmitted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 101 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Title amended
On October 8, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/08/2020
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sarah Lightner
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor