+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 694 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/12/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Vanessa Guerra
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor