+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 445 Yeas 76 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Vote reconsidered
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 442 Yeas 75 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 8, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/03/2020
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Scott VanSingel
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor