+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 751 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/12/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Steven Johnson
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor