+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 614 Yeas 106 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/06/2018
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Joseph Bellino