+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 508'18
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:26 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:39 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:36 PM
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 997 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 726 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/29/2018
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gary Howell
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor