+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections and government reform
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 596 Yeas 101 Nays 6
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/29/2016
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Lisa Lyons
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor