+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 423'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/19/2018 @ 9:09 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/20/2018 @ 1:24 PM
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/18/2018 @ 1:08 PM
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 847 Yeas 82 Nays 27
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 758 yeas 30 nays 8 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On November 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
On October 4, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 621 Yeas 81 Nays 25
- Read a third time
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/23/2018
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jason Wentworth
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor