+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 594 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/10/2016
On November 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ed McBroom
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor