+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 593 Yeas 104 Nays 3
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-6 adopted
- Substitute H-1 not adopted
- Read a second time
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/10/2016
On November 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Kivela
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor