+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 28, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 236'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/22/2020 11:34 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/22/2020 12:20 PM
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 403 yeas 23 nays 14 excused 1 not voting 0
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-2) with immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Senate substitute (S-2) concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Roll call Roll Call # 487 Yeas 86 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Presented to the Governor 10/16/2020 01:52 PM
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 401 Yeas 57 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Transmitted
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-4) adopted
- Read a second time
On September 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-4)
On August 6, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 07/23/2020
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Thomas Albert
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor