+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 638'18
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:55 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:28 PM
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:56 PM
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Immediate effect defeated
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 1059 yeas 28 nays 8 excused 1 not voting 1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Inserted full title
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Roll Call # 1043 Yeas 59 Nays 43
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with full title
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 388 Yeas 62 Nays 47
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative James Lower
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor