+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 301'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2018 @ 8:28 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 2:50 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/29/2018 @ 1:30 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 479 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 100 Nays 9
- Read a third time
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Julie Alexander
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor