+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors, and veterans
On December 2, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 505 Yeas 57 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Read a third time
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 07/22/2020
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gregory Markkanen