+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 635'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 6:22 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2018 @ 4:49 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:30 PM
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 1018 Yeas 94 Nays 13
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Enrollment vacated
- Vote on concurring reconsidered
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 1045 Yeas 93 Nays 10
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 965 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) adopted
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
On December 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
On December 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 738 Yeas 96 Nays 13
- Read a third time
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 not adopted
- Substitute H-3 adopted
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/08/2018
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Chirkun
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor