+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:26 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 797 Yeas 106 Nays 4
- Senate substitute S-9 concurred in
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-9
- Placed on order of general orders
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-9
- Substitute s-9 concurred in
- Discharge committee approved
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 907 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-9 with immediate effect and title amendment
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 626 Yeas 105 Nays 4
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Printed bill filed 11/07/2014
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Joe Haveman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor