+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 356'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 11/20/2018 @ 11:22 AM
- Approved by the Governor 11/20/2018 @ 10:35 AM
- Presented to the Governor 11/15/2018 @ 2:10 PM
On November 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 589 yeas 34 nays 0 excused 3 not voting 0
On November 8, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 341 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/02/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Julie Alexander
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor