+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 530'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:07 PM 12/31/18 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/28/2018 @ 2:10 PM
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/26/2018 @ 8:04 PM
On December 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 965 Yeas 96 Nays 11
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on immediate passage
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 943 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On November 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On October 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 620 Yeas 96 Nays 10
- Transmitted
On October 3, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/01/2018
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Bizon
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor