+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 348'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/23/2018 @ 2:01 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/24/2018 @ 9:00 AM
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/10/2018 @ 9:51 AM
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 589 Yeas 78 Nays 28
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 564 yeas 35 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on energy and technology
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 345 Yeas 77 Nays 31
- Read a third time
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 05/01/2018
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Energy Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dan Lauwers
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor