+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 373 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/26/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dave Pagel