+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 311'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/29/2018 @ 1:50 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2018 @ 8:48 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/20/2018 @ 2:16 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 467 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 317 Yeas 105 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 04/25/2018
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jeff Noble