+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 288 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/08/2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Roth
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor