+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary
On October 14, 2020 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 10/16/2020
On October 1, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/05/2020 03:38 PM
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 390 yeas 30 nays 7 excused 1 not voting 0
On September 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Substitute (H-4) adopted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 74 Nays 29 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary, with substitute (H-3)
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/23/2020
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ann Bollin
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor