+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation and infrastructure
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 278 Yeas 106 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/17/2020
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Government Operations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jason Sheppard
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor