+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic development and international investment
On December 1, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 541 Yeas 61 Nays 47
- Read a third time
On November 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On September 13, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/08/2016
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pat Somerville