+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 383'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 01/04/2021 12:58 PM
- Approved by the Governor 01/04/2021 10:38 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 05:59 PM
On December 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 506 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On September 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 416 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Vote reconsidered
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 411 Yeas 103 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/11/2020
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tim Sneller
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor