+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 376'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 01/04/2021 12:44 PM
- Approved by the Governor 01/04/2021 10:24 AM
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 04:47 PM
On December 17, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 596 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Senate substitute (S-3) concurred in
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-3) with title amendment
On December 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Substitute (s-3) adopted
- Vote reconsidered
- Postponed temporarily
On December 16, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
- Placed on immediate passage
- Title amended
- Passed roll call # 568 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Passed roll call # 510 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
On September 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Read a third time
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 449 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/11/2020
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor