+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/27/2016 @ 1:06 PM
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 771 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 487 Yeas 101 Nays 6
On September 21, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On September 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/08/2016
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Martin Howrylak
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor