+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 413'14 with immediate effect 2014 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:47 AM 2014 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/27/2014 @ 9:26 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/23/2014 @ 2:04 PM
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 776 Yeas 100 Nays 10
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and title amendment
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 867 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) adopted
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2 and amendment(s)
- Substitute s-2 as amended concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2 as amended
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On October 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 542 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On September 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On September 24, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 09/24/2014
On September 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Peter Pettalia
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor