+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On November 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
On November 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
- Referred to second reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 499 Yeas 102 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Transmitted
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-3)
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 06/04/2020
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kathy Crawford
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor