+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 479 Yeas 102 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On September 8, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 09/07/2016
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Klint Kesto
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor